MA H4769 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4849

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing remote participation at representative town meetings due to the COVID-19 emergency. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing remote participation at representative town meetings due to the COVID-19 emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-09HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4849
2020-07-06HouseRecommitted to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
2020-07-06HouseRules suspended
2020-07-06HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
2020-06-01SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-23HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
2020-04-21HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4849 (Replaced by) 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback