MA H4776 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4826
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4826
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4826
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing survivor benefits to Ava Roy, the daughter of fallen firefighter Christopher Roy. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing survivor benefits to Ava Roy, the daughter of fallen firefighter Christopher Roy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4826 |
2020-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4826 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 203 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4776 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4776.pdf |