MA H4842 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the city of Framingham to erect a permanent pavilion exceeding 600 square feet in Mary Dennison Park in said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding a pavilion in Mary Dennison Park
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #305 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 291 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 291 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #305 (40 Yeas to 0 Nays) |
2020-12-16 | House | Enacted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 291) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-09-17 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-07-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |