MA H4848 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4773
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 288 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 288 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the use of inserts to accompany municipal property tax bills in the city of Medford
Title
Regarding the use of inserts to accompany municipal property tax bills in the city of Medford
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 288 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-10-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-10-25 | House | Enacted |
2018-10-25 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-10-25 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-09-27 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-09-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-09-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-30 | House | New draft of H4773 |
2018-07-30 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4773 (Replaces) 2018-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4848
H3892 (Similar To) 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
H3991 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2017
H4373 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018
H3981 (Similar To) 2017-10-31 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3892 (Similar To) 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
H3991 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2017
H4373 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018
H3981 (Similar To) 2017-10-31 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4848 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4848.pdf |