MA H4852 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4841
Note: Replaces legislation S2395
Note: Replaces legislation S2395
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House bill No. 4841, as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. July 9, 2020.
Title
Relative to accountability for vulnerable children and families
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #271 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #271 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0) |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read third |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2884 |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read second |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2884 |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Accompanied by S2395 |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-07-09 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 197) |
2020-07-09 | House | H4841, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4841 (Replaces) 2020-07-09 - Published as amended, see H4852
S2395 (Replaces) 2020-10-29 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S2395 (Replaces) 2020-10-29 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4852 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4852.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/191/SenateRollCall271.pdf |