MA H4884 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4835
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his disapproval of a certain section, and also with recommendations of amendments of certain sections contained in the engrossed Bill promoting climate change adaptation, environmental and natural resource protection, and investment in recreational assets and opportunity [see House, No. 4835]. August 9, 2018.
Title
A message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his disapproval of a certain section, and also with recommendations of amendments of certain sections contained in the engrossed Bill promoting climate change adaptation, environmental and natural resource protection, and investment in recreational assets and opportunity [see House, No. 4835]. August 9, 2018.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-08-13 | House | See H4835 |
Same As/Similar To
H4835 (Replaced by) 2018-08-13 - Section returned with veto (see section 6) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2590 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2591
S2591 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - See H4613
H4889 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4879 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4880 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 279 of the Acts of 2018
H4881 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4883 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4882 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2590 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2591
S2591 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - See H4613
H4889 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4879 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4880 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 279 of the Acts of 2018
H4881 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4883 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4882 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4884 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4884.pdf |