MA H4885 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5211
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - New draft substituted, see H5211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - New draft substituted, see H5211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Fernandes of Falmouth, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Dylan A. Fernandes that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to lease a certain parcel of land to the Martha’s Vineyard Shellfish Group, Inc. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the lease of Commonwealth property in the town of Oak Bluffs to the Martha's Vineyard Shellfish Group, Inc. for the property's continued use for shellfish propagation and other fisheries resources research and management activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | New draft substituted, see H5211 |
2020-12-22 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-12-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-12-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-12-22 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H5211 |
2020-10-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday October 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-08-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/12/2020 from 04:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-07-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5211 (Replaced by) 2021-01-05 - Laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4885 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4885.pdf |