MA H4895 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership and the reviving and continuation of the Ocean Acidification Commission. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve creating a technical fix to the Ocean Acidification Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4895 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4895.pdf |