MA H4898 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 349 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 349 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fees assessed by the Dracut Water Supply District. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to fees assessed by the Dracut Water Supply District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 349 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-24 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-09-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-09-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-09-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-09-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-08-23 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2018-07-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H979 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1703 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H979 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1703 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4898 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4898.pdf |