MA H4902 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of North Andover be authorized to amend the charter of said town relative to posting of town meeting warrants. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the Town of North Andover Town Meeting Warrant Posting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4902 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4902.pdf |