MA H4907 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Executive Office of Labor and Workforce Development to establish a works progress to employ certain unemployed residents. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To establish the Massachusetts works progress administration
Sponsors
Rep. Danillo Sena [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5136 |
2020-07-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/07/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5136 (Replaced by) 2020-12-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4907 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4907.pdf |