MA H4921 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3976
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting awareness of sewage pollution in public waters
Title
Promoting awareness of sewage pollution in public waters
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 249 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-01-05 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-07-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 249) |
2020-07-30 | House | Read third |
2020-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-30 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-30 | House | New draft of H3976 |
2020-07-30 | House | Pending new draft of H3976 |
2020-07-30 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3976 (Replaces) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4921
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4921 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4921.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/Journal/House/191/RollCalls/hj07302020_RollCalls.pdf |