MA H4931 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the town manager of the town of Arlington. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the Town Manager Act of the town of Arlington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-01-01 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Bills in Third Reading report accepted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-11-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-11-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-10-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2067 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S2161
H3774 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2161 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
H4607 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2018
H3774 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2161 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
H4607 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4931 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4931.pdf |