MA H4950 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2019 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2019 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-10-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3599 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S3 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
H3775 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2017
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3599 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S3 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
H3775 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4950 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4950.pdf |