MA H4954 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Charde Christophe, an employee of the Department of Youth Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Charde Christophe
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Pocket vetoed | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-21 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-11-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-11-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-11-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-10-29 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2018-10-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4968 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2018
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4986 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 388 of the Acts of 2018
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
H4997 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
H5020 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 389 of the Acts of 2018
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4968 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2018
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4986 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 388 of the Acts of 2018
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
H4997 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
H5020 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 389 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4954 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4954.pdf |