MA H4956 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4932
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Harwich to issue three additional liquor licenses.
Title
Authorizing the town of Harwich to issue three additional liquor licenses.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-28 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-11-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-11-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-11-05 | House | New draft of H4932 |
2018-11-05 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4932 (Replaces) 2018-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4956
H2636 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4437
H3954 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H4628 (Similar To) 2018-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2018
H3982 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4459
H4958 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 414 of the Acts of 2018
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2636 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4437
H3954 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H4628 (Similar To) 2018-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2018
H3982 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4459
H4958 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 414 of the Acts of 2018
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4956 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4956.pdf |