MA H5045 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-8-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-16 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-16 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to improvements to the local and regional public health systems to address disparities in the delivery of public health services. Public Health.
Title
Relative to accelerating improvements to the local and regional public health system to address disparities in the delivery of public health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-10-08 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5045 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5045.pdf |