MA H5151 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-04 - Accompanied H5164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-04 - Accompanied H5164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House bill No. 5150, as changed by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading and as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. November 12, 2020.
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2021 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #299 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 281 (Y: 143 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 281 (Y: 143 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Accompanied H5164 |
2020-12-04 | House | Reported, in part, by H5164 |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Rodrigues-Friedman-O'Connor), in concurrence |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendments |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-11-23 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Michlewitz-Garlick-Smola) |
2020-11-23 | House | House NON-concurred with the Senate amendment |
2020-11-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #299 (39 Yeas - 0 Nays) |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2955 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Read third |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S4, amended |
2020-11-18 | Senate | For Senate actions, see S4 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Read second |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, November 17, 2020, pursuant to an order previously adopted |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S4 |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-11-12 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 143 YEAS to 14 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 281) |
2020-11-12 | House | H5150, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H5150 (Replaces) 2020-11-12 - See H5151
S4 (Replaced by) 2020-11-18 - See H5151
S2955 (Replaces) 2020-11-23 - See H5151
H5164 (Replaced by) 2021-01-05 - Item 0340-0198 passed over veto - see Roll Call #472 (Yeas 34 to Nays 5)
S4 (Replaced by) 2020-11-18 - See H5151
S2955 (Replaces) 2020-11-23 - See H5151
H5164 (Replaced by) 2021-01-05 - Item 0340-0198 passed over veto - see Roll Call #472 (Yeas 34 to Nays 5)