MA H584 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4434
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand access to school meals. Education.
Title
To expand access to school meals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4434 |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H637 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1095 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1916 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4434 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H637 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1095 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1916 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H4434 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H584 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H584.pdf |