MA H587 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reducing exposures to non-ionizing radiation stemming from wireless connectivity and electricity in public schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing public school nonionizing radiation and wireless exposures

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H557 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
H524 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H566 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H439 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H425 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
S272 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
S341 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H545 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H473 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1891 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3871 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2324 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback