MA H615 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in 428
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the disposal of resources for determining eligibility for Medicaid. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To preserve special needs trusts for disabled seniors

Sponsors

Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Donald Humason [R]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. David Biele [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-01JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in 428
2019-07-30SenateSenate concurred
2019-07-29HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H1172 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1129 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1144 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1199 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S705 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S704 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1211 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback