MA H617 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S368
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Accompanied S368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Accompanied S368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to contracts for continuing care retirement communities. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to disclosing continuing care retirement community entrance fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Accompanied S368 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S368 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H617 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H617.pdf |