MA H624 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Ms. Peake of Provincetown, a petition of Sarah K. Peake and others that persons diagnosed with HIV or AIDS be eligible for home care to be administered by the Executive Office of Elder Affairs. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Massachusetts home care eligibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31SenateAccompanied S364
2019-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S364 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback