MA H639 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4403

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to child care expenses for candidates while performing work or attending certain campaign events. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting parents running for public office

Sponsors

Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-06-16SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-09HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-10HouseRecommitted to the committee on Election Laws
2020-02-10HouseReported on a part of H4403
2020-02-10HouseReported from the committee on House Rules
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4403
2019-05-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H113 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H106 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H3409 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H81 (Similar To) 2020-05-13 - Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, December 16, 2020
H1423 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S408 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S880 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S30 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2395
H175 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2211 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback