MA H646 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the development of economically sound and environmentally progressive solid waste management strategies to improve recycling. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Improving recycling in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-06-22 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2115 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1916 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H824 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H974 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2259 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1916 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H824 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H974 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2259 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H646 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H646.pdf |