MA H689 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the board of registrars in certain towns. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to the board of registrars of voters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H290 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2275 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H290 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2275 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H689 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H689.pdf |