MA H69 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges (House, No. 69). January 22, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #63 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House On Enactment State Loan Yea and Nay No. 60 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 57 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2019
2019-06-06SenateLaid before the Governor
2019-06-06SenateEnacted -see Roll Call #63 (40 Yeas to 0 Nays)
2019-05-29HouseEnacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 60)
2019-05-23SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-05-23HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-05-21SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-05-21SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-05-20SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended
2019-05-20SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass
2019-05-13SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
2019-05-08HousePassed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 57)
2019-05-08HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third
2019-05-08HouseRules suspended
2019-05-08HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-05-08HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-05-06HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-04-18HouseHearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
2019-04-10HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
2019-02-28JointHearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in A-1
2019-01-24SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3065 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback