MA H720 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to lower the voting age for municipal elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring municipal participation of the widest eligible range

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-06-16SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-09HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-09HouseRecommitted to the committee on Election Laws
2020-03-09HouseRules suspended
2020-02-24HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
2020-01-16JointHearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H722 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H657 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H662 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S409 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H663 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback