MA H74 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-29 - Reported, in part, by H4003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-29 - Reported, in part, by H4003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for Fiscal Year 2019 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for Fiscal Year 2019 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | House | Reported, in part, by H4003 |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported, in part, by H3638 |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported, in part, by H3505 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H1 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Reported, in part, by H3800
H485 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3220 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3505 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Published as amended, see H3506
H3506 (Similar To) 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2019
S1476 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S310 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3638 (Similar To) 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2019
H3800 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - See H3801
H3799 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - See H3800
H3801 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied H4000
H3702 (Similar To) 2019-05-29 - Accompanied H3819
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2019
S2255 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2019
H4003 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2019
H485 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3220 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3505 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Published as amended, see H3506
H3506 (Similar To) 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2019
S1476 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S310 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3638 (Similar To) 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2019
H3800 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - See H3801
H3799 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - See H3800
H3801 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied H4000
H3702 (Similar To) 2019-05-29 - Accompanied H3819
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2019
S2255 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2019
H4003 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H74 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H74.pdf |