MA H764 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2463
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the adoption of certain research animals. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting research animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2463 |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H758 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3468 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4499
S534 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
H1435 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2494
H1492 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1109 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2463 (Replaced by) 2020-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3468 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4499
S534 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
H1435 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2494
H1492 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1109 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2463 (Replaced by) 2020-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H764 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H764.pdf |