MA H778 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5073

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to carbon pricing on the sale of fossil fuels. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to carbon pricing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5073
2019-05-09JointHearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H2930 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2220 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H5073 (Replaced by) 2020-10-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback