MA H82 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to term limits for judges. The Judiciary.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to the term of judicial officers
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Golden [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Rady Mom [D] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. David Vieira [R] | Rep. David Nangle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H79 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H85 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
H84 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
H83 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - No further action taken
H3276 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S14 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - No further action taken
S2163 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Resolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S15 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S2211 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H85 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
H84 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
H83 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - No further action taken
H3276 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S14 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - No further action taken
S2163 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Resolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S15 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S2211 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H82 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H82.pdf |