MA H832 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3983
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to address climate protection, green economy and global warming solutions. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To create a 2050 roadmap to a clean and thriving commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3983 |
2019-05-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2977 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S435 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H829 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H3983 (Replaced by) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2977 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S435 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H829 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H3983 (Replaced by) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H832 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H832.pdf |