MA H842 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5073
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to carbon stock on natural and working lands and the release of measurable greenhouse gases. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To sustain natural and working lands carbon in communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5073 |
2019-05-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H778 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H522 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H412 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
S1319 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2014 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2130 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S283 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H399 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H5073 (Replaced by) 2020-10-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H778 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H522 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H412 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
S1319 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2014 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2130 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S283 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H399 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H5073 (Replaced by) 2020-10-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H842 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H842.pdf |