MA H849 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mrs. Poirier of North Attleborough, a petition of Elizabeth A. Poirier that the Department of Environmental Protection be directed to revise regulations to protect and preserve the camping industry. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve to protect and preserve family camping in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Senate | Accompanied S449 |
2019-04-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1834 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
H1835 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S449 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1990 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1835 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S449 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1990 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H849 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H849.pdf |