MA H868 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a commission on livestock shelter requirements within the Department of Agricultural Resources to develop standards for the appropriate sheltering of livestock from weather elements. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission on livestock shelter requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H4247 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback