MA H871 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Conservation and Recreation to establish a program to provide for the use of certain state owned land for community gardens and farmers' markets. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the use of Department of Conservation and Recreation property for farmers markets and community gardens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-04-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H725 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H863 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H866 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H735 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
S440 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2176 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2209 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2019
H863 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H866 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H735 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
S440 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2176 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2209 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H871 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H871.pdf |