MA H884 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2501
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize bow and arrow hunting on Sundays. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Authorizing the use of bow and arrows for Sunday hunting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2501 |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H887 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S471 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S472 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2501 (Replaced by) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S471 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S472 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2501 (Replaced by) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H884 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H884.pdf |