MA H899 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to abolish the Auto Damage Appraiser Licensing Board within the Division of Insurance. Financial Services.
Title
Reforming the process of appraising motor vehicle damage covered by auto insurance policies
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H899 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H899.pdf |