MA H9 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Inspector General (House, No. 7) as relates to further regulating the laws pertaining to said office. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to Chapter 12A
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H11 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H10 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1503 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2292 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1378 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1342 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H1902 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4089
H673 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H4001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4528
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4196 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019
H10 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1503 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2292 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1378 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1342 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H1902 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4089
H673 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H4001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4528
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4196 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H9 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H9.pdf |