MA S104 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2829
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2829
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2829
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Craft Brewers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to Craft Brewers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2829 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Read second |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2829 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2400 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H327 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
S2829 (Replaced by) 2020-07-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2841
H2400 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H327 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
S2829 (Replaced by) 2020-07-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2841
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S104 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S104.pdf |