MA S1043 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3825
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to collective bargaining dues. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to collective bargaining dues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3825 |
2019-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2372 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1467 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2385 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1555 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3825 (Replaced by) 2019-06-05 - New draft substituted, see H3854
H3854 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2019
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
S2273 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
H2372 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1467 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2385 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1555 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3825 (Replaced by) 2019-06-05 - New draft substituted, see H3854
H3854 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2019
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
S2273 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1043 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1043.pdf |