MA S1051 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2713
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide bereavement leave to employees in Massachusetts. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To provide bereavement leave to employees in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2713 |
2019-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1105 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1602 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1692 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2713 (Replaced by) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1602 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1692 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2713 (Replaced by) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1051 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1051.pdf |