MA S1157 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve access to care by removing barriers to practice for psychiatric clinical nurse specialists. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To improve access to care by removing barriers to practice for psychiatric nurse mental health clinical specialists
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
Sen. Nick Collins [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1137 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
H1731 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4535
S1137 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
H1731 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4535
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1157 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1157.pdf |