MA S1173 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance identification of taxicab operators. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Enhancing identification of taxicab operators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
S2043 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - New draft substituted, see S2555
H3066 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1413 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2990 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1951 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H243 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H516 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Senate concurred
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
S2043 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - New draft substituted, see S2555
H3066 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1413 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2990 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1951 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H243 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H516 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1173 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1173.pdf |