MA S1184 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to proceeds from the sale of bonds. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to proceeds from the sale of bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] | Rep. David Linsky [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported favorably and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2019-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H31 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H32 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H32 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1184 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1184.pdf |