MA S1207 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce atmospheric pollution . Public Health.
Title
To reduce atmospheric pollution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2547 |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1958 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1779 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1958 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1779 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1207.pdf |