MA S1208 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2745
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to end of life options. Public Health.
Title
Relative to end of life options
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2745 |
2020-04-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H38 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied H202
S367 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Accompanied H614
H630 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Senate concurred
H1052 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1926 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4782
H2806 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H3924 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4043 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
S2745 (Replaced by) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S367 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Accompanied H614
H630 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Senate concurred
H1052 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1926 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4782
H2806 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H3924 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4043 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
S2745 (Replaced by) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1208 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1208.pdf |