MA S1212 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the restoration of oral health benefits for MassHealth recipients. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the restoration of MassHealth adult dental benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S774 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1917 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S545 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1475 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1005 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1321 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3557 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S774 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1917 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S545 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1475 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1005 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1321 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3557 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1212 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1212.pdf |