MA S1234 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation modernizing childhood lead poisoning prevention. Public Health.
Title
Modernizing childhood lead poisoning prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-29 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Accompanied by S2206 |
2020-02-10 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1533 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S501 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S1293 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H550 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1525 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1326 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2765
H1498 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2610
H3302 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1306 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2835
S2206 (Replaces) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied S1234
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S501 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S1293 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H550 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1525 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1326 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2765
H1498 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2610
H3302 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1306 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2835
S2206 (Replaces) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied S1234
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1234 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1234.pdf |